HI HB2581 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a community food forest program in the Department of Land and Natural Resources that shall work collaboratively with local government and community organizations to provide sources of healthy food statewide. Appropriate funds.
Title
Community Food Forest Program; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2967 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2581&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2581_.HTM |