HI HB2574 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hawaii Rules of Evidence to authorize nonresident property crime victims to testify in criminal proceedings by a live two-way video connection.
Title
Rules of Evidence; Nonresident Property Crime Victims; Video Testimony by Witnesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2574&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2574_.HTM |