HI HB2574 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Disability and Communication Access Board as the issuing agency that authorizes the issuance of removable windshield placards, temporary removable windshield placards, special license plates, and identification cards; to extend the validity of the placard from 4 to 6 years. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2574 HD2)
Title
Parking for Disabled Persons
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Rhoads, Saiki, Pine. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Belatti, Carroll. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-02-10 10:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to HLT, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2727 (Same As) 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee(s) on HMS/TIA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 2/9/2010 1:30:00 PM in conference room 016.