HI HB2561 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts recommendations of the Penal Code Review Committee convened pursuant to House Concurrent Resolution No. 155 S.D. 1 Regular Session 2015. (HB2561 CD1)
Title
Administration of Justice; Penal Code and Related Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2016-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Johanson, McKelvey, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Har, Kawakami, McDermott, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (8) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K.Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:20PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, LoPresti Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Ward. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K.Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3449) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-30-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL,WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Woodson. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-05-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2964 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26