HI SB2964 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts recommendations of the penal code review committee convened pursuant to HCR155 (2015). Effective 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Administration of Justice; Penal Code and Related Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Slom, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2674) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-16 9:00AM in conference room CR016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2561 (Same As) 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).