HI HB256 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB256
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Holt, McKelvey, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Holt, McKelvey, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires coffee blend labels to disclose regional origins and per cent by weight of the blended coffees. Prohibits using geographic origins of coffee in labeling or advertising for roasted or instant coffee that contains less than 51 per cent coffee by weight from that geographic origin.
Title
Relating To Coffee Labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Holt, McKelvey, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-01-27 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Holt, McKelvey, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=256&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB256_.HTM |