HI HB2556 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to give first preference to environmentally-sensitive cleaning and maintenance products that carry the Design for the Environment label designated by the Design for the Environment Program of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, for use in public schools. (HB2556 HD1)
Title
Health; Environment; Cleaning Products; Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Har, Luke, Sagum. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-10 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) M. Lee, McKelvey excused (2). | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 140-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Hanohano, Nakashima, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Chang, Manahan, Rhoads. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-03-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EDN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2709 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:00PM in conference room 329.