HI HB255 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs department of agriculture, in conjunction with agribusiness development corporation, to develop an agricultural water plan for Ka`u and south Kona.
Title
Agriculture; Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-09 9:00am in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-06-09 11:15AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-06-09. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-04-09 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=255&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB255_.HTM |