HI HB2538 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds exemptions for any kindergarten, school, or program licensed by the Charter School Review Panel, the Hawaii Council of Private Schools, or any federal agency from child care licensing requirements of the Department of Human Services. (HB2538 HD1)
Title
Child Care Licensing; Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Pine. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2800 (Same As) 2012-06-26 - (S) Act 163, 6/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).