HI HB2502 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for involuntary termination of parental rights in cases of incest. Provides for denial of custody and visitation rights of convicted parent and preserves the custodial parent's right to court ordered child support.
Title
Termination of Parental Rights; Incest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Oshiro, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-04-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2502&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2502_.HTM |