HI HB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in the rental of real property based on lawful source of income. (HB25 HD1)
Title
Discrimination in Rental Transactions; Source of Income
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-02-15 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) McDermott, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |