HI HB2489 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 209, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 209, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the establishment of a veterans services counselor IV position within the Office of Veterans' Services to assist all veterans, with a primary focus on female veterans and for the Vietnam veterans fiftieth anniversary commemoration. (HB2489 CD1)
Title
Office of Veterans' Services; Veterans Services Counselor IV; Vietnam Veterans fiftieth Anniversary; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Act 209, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2016-07-07 | House | Act 209, on 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Nakashima, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 3:15PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-16 at 3:15PM in Conference Room 312. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Nakashima, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3551) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Wakai. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2942) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 44). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 161-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to VMI, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |