HI HB2485 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the duty of school community councils to review and approve the academic and financial plans of their respective schools. Removing the authority of principals to set aside any decision made by school community councils.
Title
School Community Councils; Academic and Financial Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-08-10 2:05pm in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2485&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2485_.HTM |