HI HB2475 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 082, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 082, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes July 31 of each year as La Hoihoi Ea. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Holidays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 082, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 082, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Nakashima, Tam, Kapela; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ward. |
2022-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Taniguchi, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Nakashima, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Kapela, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 860) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HWN/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3482) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Tokioka. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |