HI HB2474 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contracts for construction on public lands to comply with wage and hour requirements set forth in chapter 104, HRS.
Title
Public Works; Wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Re-referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2724 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2474&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2474_.HTM |