HI HB2469 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish an Unemployment Compensation Insolvency Special Fund to be administered by the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations and expended solely to resolve an Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund insolvency emergency declared by the Governor. Permit the Governor to declare an Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund insolvency emergency and expend moneys from the Unemployment Compensation Insolvency Special Fund if the Director of Finance determines that the trust fund balance is insufficient to meet the State's obligations. Appropriates moneys into the Unemployment Compensation Insolvency Special Fund. Effective 12/25/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 92). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Tam; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Insolvency
Unemployment Compensation Insolvency Special Fund
Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund
Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund Insolvency Emergency
Insolvency
Unemployment Compensation Insolvency Special Fund
Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund
Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund Insolvency Emergency