HI HB2463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 073, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 073, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the definition of "employee" in Hawaii's Wage and Hour Law to exclude any employee who receives guaranteed compensation totaling $4,000 or more a month. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Wage And Hour Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Act 073, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2024-06-24 | House | Act 073, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3760) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3152 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.