HI HB2462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies who may access information stored in the electronic prescription accountability system. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Electronic Prescription Accountability System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 143). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3151 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN.