HI HB245 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any person who is eligible to vote and applies for a new or renewal motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, or instruction permit, or a new, renewal, or duplicate identification card be automatically registered to vote if that person is not already registered to vote unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Authorizes access to and electronic transmission of databases maintained or operated by the counties or the department of transportation containing driver's license or identification card information to election officials and the statewide voter registration system.
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB302 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM.
HB245 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
HB245 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=245&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB245_.HTM |