HI SB302 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any person who is eligible to vote and applies for a new or renewal motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, or instruction permit, or a new, renewal, or duplicate identification card be automatically registered to vote if that person is not already registered to vote unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Authorizes access to and electronic transmission of databases maintained or operated by the counties or the department of transportation containing driver's license or identification card information to election officials and the statewide voter registration system.
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/TRE, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB245 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB302 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/TRE, WAM.
SB302 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/TRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=302&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB302_.HTM |