HI HB2448 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the statutes pertaining to mental health services for children and adolescents provided by the Child and Adolescent Mental Health Division of the Department of Health to reflect the current mental health systems of care that address intensive mental health needs of children and adolescents.
Title
Relating To Mental Health Services For Children And Adolescents.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 02-09-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3137 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2448&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2448_.HTM |