HI HB2444 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 772).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 772).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to conduct criminal history record checks of applicants for permits to operate as a hemp processor. Sunsets 7/1/2027. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal History Record Checks.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 772). |
2024-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-18 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Garcia excused (1). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 763). |
2024-04-17 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, McKelvey). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3733) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HHS/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/AEN deferred the measure until 03-15-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:02PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS/AEN, JDC. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 543-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-13 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Lowen, Pierick. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from JHA/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Woodson. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/AGR on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3133 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16