HI HB2444 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the grounds under which an employer may take employment action without committing a discriminatory practice.
Title
Employment Practices; Discriminatory Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2444&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2444_.HTM |