HI HB2443 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 3-year accessible playgrounds pilot program under the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates moneys. (HB2443 HD1)
Title
Relating To An Accessible Playgrounds Pilot Program For Disabled Children.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 39). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, C. Lee, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-05 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |