HI HB2439 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a 10% refundable tax credit for construction or renovation costs incurred on a qualified hotel facility before December 31, 2015.
Title
Construction Task Force; Tax Credit; Hotel Construction; Remodeling; Resort Area
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-10 11:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-11-10 11:00am in conference room 312. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI/EBM on Monday, 02-08-10 9:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Referred to TCI/EBM, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2439&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2439_.HTM |