HI HB2436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a fine, not to exceed $100 per violation, for mopeds owners who fail to comply with moped registration requirements. (HB2436 HD1)
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 341). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-22-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2854 (Same As) 2018-07-05 - Act 077, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).