HI HB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the offenses of prostitution and solicitation of prostitution to cover patrons of prostitutes. Makes the offense of habitual solicitation of prostitution a class C felony, and applies the law to those who habitually patronize prostitutes. Removes the sunset date of Act 192, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB242 HD1)
Title
Promoting Prostitution
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-07-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 64). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-01-11. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 302. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |