HI HB2418 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the focus, scope, and management of the agribusiness development corporation (ADC). Appropriates funds to ADC for a consultant for planning, an accountant, and for security on ADC property. Repeals the requirement that all agricultural projects, agricultural development plans, and project facility programs developed by ADC be approved by the board of agriculture before implementation. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 346). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Tokioka. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |