HI HB2416 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 183, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 183, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that intangible property shall be exempt from the general excise tax used outside the State. Subjects intangible property acquired from an unlicensed seller and used in the State to the use tax at 4 percent of the value of the property. (HB2416 CD1)
Title
Relating To Tax On Intangible Property.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 183, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 183, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, McDermott, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-20-18 1:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-18-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Tupola. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2018-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 446) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-23-18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3027) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Har, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |