HI HB2413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the prohibition of qualified persons or firms from receiving direct or indirect financing for construction projects from any governmental contracting agency as a condition of prevailing wage terms. Extends the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation approval and certification period in which construction or rehabilitation of certain projects can qualify for general excise tax exemptions. Repeals the limitation of the costs to contracting, including the annual cap on allowable general excise tax and use tax costs applicable to contracting. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Todd. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-02-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3102 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HOU, WAM.