HI HB2408 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG/HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG/HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the homelessness special fund. Establishes a community shelter commission in each county. Raises the conveyance tax and directs revenues toward experimental or demonstration housing projects administered by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation and by the Hawaii Public Housing Authority and homeless facilities and programs administered by the Department of Human Services.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSG/HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2408&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2408_.HTM |