HI HB2394 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes interest on unpaid penalties and fines; requires filing with tax appeal court a notice of transfer upon transfer of appeal to tax appeal court; amends rate of interest on amounts paid out of litigated claims fund; and requires full payment of assessed taxes, penalties, and interest for the first appeal where the assessment exceeds $50,000.
Title
Tax Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2923 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:30PM in conference room 312.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2394&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2394_.HTM |