HI HB2383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a vulnerable coastal property purchaser statement to be executed by the purchaser or transferee with the sale or transfer of vulnerable coastal real estate.
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2670 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2383&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2383_.HTM |