HI HB2379 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants exclusive original jurisdiction in matters of annulment, divorce, and separation and other certain cases to the family court of the circuit in which an applicant is domiciled at the time the application is filed. Repeals the requirement that a person be domiciled or physically present in the State for a continuous period of at least three months before filing for divorce. Repeals the requirement that a person be domiciled or physically present in the State for a continuous period of at least six months before completing a divorce. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Divorce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20 at 2:15PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2268 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).