HI HB2364 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - The committee(s) on HOU/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - The committee(s) on HOU/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the conveyance tax rate for certain properties. Exempts conveyances of certain real property from the conveyance tax. Establishes a new conveyance tax rate for multifamily residential properties. Eliminates the cap on the amount of conveyance tax collections allocated to the Land Conservation Fund and Rental Housing Revolving Fund. Allocates ten percent of conveyance tax collections to the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund for the purpose of funding infrastructure programs in transit-oriented development areas. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 332-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, M. Mizuno. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-07-24 8:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3053 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Allocations
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Multifamily Residential Properties
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Multifamily Residential Properties
Rental Housing Revolving Fund