HI HB2351 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the judiciary for the hiring of two judges and six support staff positions in the Family Court of the First Judicial Circuit. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2351 HD1)
Title
Judiciary; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 01-30-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |