HI HB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB235
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the $10 per visit per day cap on the dollar-for-dollar match received by Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program beneficiaries under the Hawaii Healthy Food Incentive Program, also known as the Double Up Food Bucks Program. Specifies that healthy proteins are eligible purchases under the program. Makes an appropriation to the Department of Agriculture to expand funding for the program.
Title
Relating To Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB235 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB512 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 177, on 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
SB512 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 177, on 07/02/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=235&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB235_.HTM |