HI HB2348 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or deletes statutes containing federal commercial driver's licensing requirements that are addressed in Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Title
Highway; Safety; Motor Vehicle; Commercial Driver's Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-03-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2898 (Same As) 2014-05-01 - Act 072, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).