HI HB2346 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the civil service exemption for employees hired under the tenant hire program by the Hawaii Public Housing Authority by removing the percentage limit on such hires.
Title
Tenant Hire Program; Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2875 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2346&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2346_.HTM |