HI HB2344 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the criminal offense statute for tampering with physical evidence to adopt the wording of the Model Penal Code for the same offense. The class of offense is unchanged.
Title
Relating To Physical Evidence.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3033 (Same As) 2024-07-09 - Act 242, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2344&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2344_.HTM |