HI HB2339 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amendments to specify that initiation of a case in Tax Appeals Court requires service of process on the Director of Taxation as described in the Hawaii Rules of Civil Procedure.
Title
Taxes; Initiation of Tax Appeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 5:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2889 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to JDL, WAM.