HI HB2335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Director of Public Safety to appoint the Mental Health Branch Administrator and Mental Health Section Administrators without regard to Chapter 76, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Correctional Health Care; Appointment of Administrators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-06-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to PBS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2885 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to PBS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28