HI HB2329 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the hazard mitigation special fund for the Hawaii emergency management agency. Appropriates funds. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2885 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).