HI HB2319 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the statutes to protect the privacy of developmental disability and mental health patients' health information, while allowing reasonable use and disclosure as provided by the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (HIPAA). Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2319 HD1)
Title
Privacy of Health Care Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3). |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson. |
2014-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2869 (Same As) 2014-07-08 - Act 214, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).