HI SB2869 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 214, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 214, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the statutes to protect the privacy of developmental disability and mental health information, while allowing reasonable use and disclosure as provided by the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996. (SB2869 HD1)
Title
Privacy of Health Care Information; Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Act 214, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2014-07-08 | House | Act 214, on 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-25 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 713). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Solomon, Tokuda. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-14. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-24-14. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:50AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Hee Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Creagan Co-Chairs; Hashem, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 623). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-14 at 2:00PM. |
2014-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14 at 10:30am. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 316) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2514) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2114) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).