HI HB2313 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the income tax provision that requires the reporting of gambling winnings but not losses. (HB2313 HD1)
Title
Income Tax; Gambling Losses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 192). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Finnegan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-10 4:05PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to Friday, 02-12-10, 4:05 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-10-10 3:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |