HI HB231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the fiscal flexibility previously granted temporarily to the Department of Education to allow the Department to continue to use its resources in a more cost-effective manner. (HB231 HD1)
Title
Preaudits of Proposed Payments; Comptroller; Education
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB857 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.