HI HB2306 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 057, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 057, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 of general revenues of the State for the Food Safety Certification Costs Grant Program for fiscal year 2018-2019. Effective June 29, 2018. (HB2306 CD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Act 057, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158). |
2018-06-29 | House | Act 057, on 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 133-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 133-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2950) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 33). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-18 8:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2733 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to AEN, WAM.