HI HB230 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school lands that are leased to benefit public educational purposes rather than simply to be used for public purposes. Authorizes the DOE to enter into lease-back agreements.
Title
Public School Lands
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB854 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=230&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB230_.HTM |