HI HB2293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the Prevent Suicide Hawaii Task Force and requires it to develop annual recommendations to the Legislature to reduce suicide by twenty-five per cent by 2025. Dissolves the task force on 1/1/2026. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/HTH, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |